Trustees ST JOHN'S RC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA CHORLTON

Charity number: 1166215
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Juliette Tomlinson Chair 20 September 2018
None on record
Dr SIOBHAN CASEY Dr Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
Jodie Gudger Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
Lisa Clennell Trustee 20 September 2017
None on record
Elena Zelenkova Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Annie Lazenby Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
HELEN TAYLOR Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record