WYTHENSHAWE FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1165044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracey Rawlins Trustee 16 January 2020
GREATER TOGETHER MANCHESTER Received: On time
PAMELA MORAN Trustee 15 December 2015 None on record
Susan Halpern Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Marie Edge Trustee 16 January 2020 None on record
Victoria McDowell Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record
JACQUELINE NARAYNSINGH Trustee 15 December 2015 None on record
Antony Petrou Trustee 28 February 2020 None on record