BRITISH THORACIC ONCOLOGY GROUP

Charity number: 1166012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £652.75k £481.13k £527.45k £585.57k £19.50k
Total expenditure £376.45k £338.84k £459.24k £563.49k £143.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £25.20k £5.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £292.25k £291.17k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £652.75k N/A £210.00k £289.40k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £265.55k N/A £429.42k £509.19k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.39k N/A £29.82k £34.61k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £4.13k £10.56k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £90.50k N/A £0 £19.69k N/A