BRITISH THORACIC ONCOLOGY GROUP

Charity number: 1166012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Hiom Trustee 20 October 2016 None on record
Professor Michael David Peake OBE Trustee 11 March 2016
UPROAR Received: On time
HAY MUSIC TRUST Received: On time
MESOTHELIOMA UK CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
Lung Cancer Nursing UK Received: On time
THE HUDDERSFIELD CONTEMPORARY MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED
Denis Talbot Trustee 17 May 2020 None on record
ANDREW MARTIN GRANGE Trustee 13 September 2016
ROY CASTLE LUNG CANCER FOUNDATION Received: 4 days late
Chris Kerr Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record