YEWDALE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 September 2017 On time Download