YEWDALE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £329.56k £168.05k £180.97k £150.30k £193.13k
Total expenditure £322.38k £162.23k £181.69k £157.77k £175.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £97.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £161.54k N/A £89.56k £77.45k £80.47k