PIRPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1165436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £8.22k £6.94k £1.20k £1.00k £1.20k
Total expenditure £5.35k £3.00k £1.01k £850 £840
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A