BURTLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1164684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.59k £12.23k £13.13k £13.95k £14.39k
Total expenditure £8.28k £11.29k £10.18k £11.89k £11.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £450 £0 N/A £100 £11.33k