BURTLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1164684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natasha Bloor Trustee 15 April 2020 None on record
David Clark Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
STEPHEN GEOFFREY ALLEN BSC HONS Trustee 30 April 2016 None on record
Ieuan Emlyn Day Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Tracy Jane Fear Trustee 18 May 2016 None on record
Rhiannon Bethony Walker Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
lynda Margaret Goodliffe Chair 19 November 2018 None on record