Accounts and annual returns GURYOSAMO INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION TRUST
Charity number: 1166589
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 25 October 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 25 October 2023 | 419 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 16 November 2023 | 441 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2018 | 14 January 2020 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2018 | 14 January 2020 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window