Accounts and annual returns HEYROD RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 03 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required