Financial history REDEEMER CHURCH COLCHESTER

Charity number: 1165450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £47.24k £71.42k £76.07k £93.98k £85.73k
Total expenditure £48.08k £63.84k £78.77k £74.88k £51.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A