THE TERRIER TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1165782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £1.00k £78.27k £3.71k £3.52k £4.98k
Total expenditure £25 £37 £1.08k £20.29k £6.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A