Trustees MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS

Charity number: 1165832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JANET FLETCHER Chair 05 December 2015
None on record
Dr Sian Miller Trustee 13 November 2021
None on record
Hannah Rebekah Burch Trustee 13 November 2021
None on record
Rev Susan Mary Huyton Trustee 07 November 2020
THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF DAME DOROTHY JEFFREYS
Received: On time
THE WREXHAM (PAROCHIAL) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WREXHAM AND DISTRICT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
MAELOR MISSION AREA
Received: On time
Anna Cory Trustee 07 November 2020
THE LLANDAFF DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
EAST VALE MINISTRY AREA
Recently registered
Ruth Eleri James Trustee 07 November 2020
None on record
Janet Margaret Day Trustee 04 November 2018
THE CHRISTIAN CENTRE FOR RURAL WALES
Received: On time
MONTGOMERYSHIRE FAMILY CRISIS CENTRE
Received: On time
The Venerable Mary Kathleen Rose Stallard Trustee 04 November 2017
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE OPEN THEOLOGY TRUST
Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR
Dr GILLIAN BEES TODD Trustee 05 November 2016
None on record
Rev ANN ELIZABETH MARY EVANS Trustee 05 December 2015
None on record