THE UNDERGROUND TRAINING STATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Robinson Trustee 13 February 2017 None on record
Dr COLIN MARTIN ROBERTSON Trustee 22 July 2016 None on record
DAVID MC DERMOTT Chair 01 October 2016 None on record
ROBERT DANIEL KEEFE Trustee 23 July 2016 None on record
SARAH STEVENSON Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
NEIL PARSLEY Trustee 20 March 2016 None on record