Financial history ISLE OF AXHOLME PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED SOCIETY

Charity number: 507271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £3.64k £7.21k £3.57k £8.69k £352
Total expenditure £3.79k £4.76k £4.14k £4.04k £543
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A