Trustees ROEHAMPTON PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 1165257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Joshua Rey Chair 05 December 2020
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH ROEHAMPTON
Received: On time
Stuart James Deacon Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
David John Ford Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Pamela Harris Trustee 23 June 2021
ROEHAMPTON TRUST LTD
Received: On time
PEST HOUSES FUND
Received: On time
Kate Hunt Trustee 23 June 2021
MAD 4 AFRICA
Received: On time
ALAN HOUSDEN Trustee 01 December 2016
ROEHAMPTON TRUST LTD
Received: On time
SUSAN ELIZABETH MELHUISH Trustee 15 December 2015
Putney United Gospel Society
Received: On time
D A SHELMERDINE Trustee 15 December 2015
None on record
CAROL EDITH CAMPBELL Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record