Financial history THE SCUNTHORPE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 507295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.70k £24.88k £130.12k £6.60k £5.38k
Total expenditure £6.00k £30.08k £59.14k £52.04k £18.28k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A