Accounts and annual returns JUNO MONETA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166097
Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2021 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2021 198 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window