Financial history JUNO MONETA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166097
Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £837 £0 £5.99k £0 £0
Total expenditure £588 £216 £5.77k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A