TREGARGUS TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1165277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £5.33k £20.02k £5.91k £9.31k £17.47k
Total expenditure £5.34k £3.04k £14.06k £4.30k £4.69k
Income from government contracts £3.58k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.07k £2.00k £4.50k £5.74k £16.35k