TREGARGUS TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1165277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KIM WONNACOTT Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
Milo Bright Trustee 18 July 2017 None on record
Andy Barclay Trustee 21 February 2017 None on record
Corinna Vivien Morrison Trustee 21 February 2017 None on record
MARIE Allen Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
Barry Davey Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
KENNETH DOHERTY Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
MR BILL TRUSCOTT Trustee 01 June 1999 None on record
SUSAN MORCOM Chair 01 January 2002 None on record
Keith Wonnacott MBE Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record