Financial history S C CHOIRS CIO

Charity number: 1165686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £33.59k £52.95k £50.01k £38.16k £24.69k
Total expenditure £43.30k £44.05k £62.49k £60.87k £15.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.00k £5.36k N/A £5.00k