Accounts and annual returns S C CHOIRS CIO

Charity number: 1165686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 13 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 01 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 17 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window