Trustees BISHOP'S WALTHAM GARDENING CLUB
Charity number: 1169353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bennett | Chair | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Perry | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bushby | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN BREACH | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Ronald Haysom | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Haysom | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maewyn Cumming | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Cassell | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill Hamill | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE JONES | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHEA MABEY | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LARRY MABEY | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.