Financial history YMCA CENTRES (SOUTH MOLTON)

Charity number: 1165990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £66.94k £47.03k £37.06k £83.45k £184.21k
Total expenditure £62.44k £50.30k £38.22k £44.73k £62.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £1.88k £2.10k £19.83k N/A