BILTON VILLAGE HALL AND MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 507523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.24k £26.68k £42.83k £48.13k £29.07k
Total expenditure £31.51k £24.52k £48.80k £50.85k £26.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A