BILTON VILLAGE HALL AND MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 507523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jon Wilson Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
MR TERRY HILL Trustee None on record
Terri Leigh Herzberg Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Mike Kitching Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Pauline Guest Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Jolene Emma Scott Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
PAUL WALTON Chair 19 January 2012 None on record
Emma Brumhead Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
James Noble Trustee 01 June 2015 None on record
Kayleigh Smallwood Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record