Trustees HOUNSLOW MUSIC SERVICE

Charity number: 1165778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Lily Bath Trustee 11 July 2022
None on record
David Frederick Swiffen Rogers Trustee 01 April 2022
THE VAUXHALL BAND
Recently registered
Dr Prabhjot Kaur Basra Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Thomas George Francis Sylvester Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record
Clare Paddi Salters Trustee 02 October 2019
THE CONSTITUTION SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE OHMI TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Hill Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
STEVEN JOHN SHOTTON B.A Trustee 19 January 2016
None on record
OONAGH MARY BARRY Trustee 19 January 2016
None on record
Charles Rupert Cautley Holderness Trustee 19 January 2016
None on record