Financial history THE GATHERING - CARDIFF

Charity number: 1168154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £440 £1.90k £2.95k £13.66k £3.85k
Total expenditure £562 £809 £2.79k £4.74k £4.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A