Financial history UK-MED

Charity number: 1166956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £2.12m £1.80m £2.65m £5.46m
Total expenditure £0 £1.64m £1.91m £2.58m £5.09m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £109.58k £354.50k
Income from government grants £0 £2.12m £1.63m £2.12m £4.88m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £462 £877 £110.48k £34.93k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £2.12m £1.80m £2.53m £5.43m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.64m £1.91m £2.58m £5.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £54.57k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.00k £2.47k £0 £4.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0