Accounts and annual returns UMM SALAMA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166266
Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 April 2023 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 April 2023 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 May 2022 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 May 2022 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 August 2021 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1204 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2021 365 days late Download Open in new window