Financial history UMM SALAMA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166266
Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £329 £0 £0 £0 £251
Total expenditure £228 £0 £0 £0 £251
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A