SUFFOLK ACCIDENT RESCUE SERVICE

Charity number: 1168764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 March 2018 43 days late Download