Accounts and annual returns London Donating Network

Charity number: 1169262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 27 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 23 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window