Financial history BEIS HATALMUD TRUST

Charity number: 1168216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £216.30k £246.94k £366.47k £499.19k £442.88k
Total expenditure £196.94k £245.15k £354.27k £478.27k £415.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A