Financial history BELBROUGHTON RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 507943
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £32.78k £26.50k £24.43k £60.22k £72.72k
Total expenditure £16.96k £32.28k £24.58k £16.85k £69.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.16k £1.16k £1.16k £19.44k £11.25k