Trustees BELBROUGHTON RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 507943
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patrick Browne Chair 18 March 2015
None on record
Iain Wain Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Karen Jones Trustee 26 May 2020
BELBROUGHTON C OF E FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 96 days
Richard Bartram Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record
Susan Pawley Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Samantha Benbow Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Michelle Browne Trustee 18 March 2015
None on record
ANDREW ADAM FINNIE Trustee
None on record