AP Challenge Trust

Charity number: 1170872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 July 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download