AP Challenge Trust

Charity number: 1170872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Joseph Corbett Trustee 22 June 2017 None on record
SARAH EVANS Trustee 21 December 2016 None on record
Nicholas Bernard Basden Trustee 21 June 2017
KILN THEATRE LIMITED Received: On time
SADLER'S WELLS TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Stephen Griffith Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
JOHN KEITH HEPBURN Trustee 06 December 2017
THE FRIENDS OF LAKEFIELD COLLEGE SCHOOL Received: On time
GUILDFORD FLAMES JUNIOR TRAINING PROGRAMME Received: On time