Accounts and annual returns BRIXINGTON PRIMARY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1167195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 01 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required