Financial history BRIXINGTON PRIMARY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1167195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £11.14k £12.12k £11.57k £15.23k £5.46k
Total expenditure £9.60k £13.78k £8.56k £16.28k £5.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A