Accounts and annual returns 1 LIFE TO LIVE

Charity number: 1167017
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 6 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window