Financial history 1 LIFE TO LIVE

Charity number: 1167017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.06k £12.17k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £17.51k £14.04k £2.50k £411 £1.91k
Income from government contracts £2.46k £9.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A