KINGFISHER CHURCH, LITTLE PAXTON

Charity number: 1168532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £102.18k £112.78k £118.72k £129.42k
Total expenditure £0 £50.17k £101.97k £99.20k £128.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A