SWINDON CHILDRENS SCRAPSTORE

Charity number: 1168574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 March 2018 42 days late Download