SWINDON CHILDRENS SCRAPSTORE

Charity number: 1168574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Cheney Trustee 27 October 2016 None on record
Joanna Rees-Bains Trustee 21 August 2015 None on record
TREVOR SMITH Chair 15 June 2012 None on record
Joanna C M Hartl Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record
Gary Stewart Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Maria Park Trustee 15 August 2014 None on record