AL-FURQAN ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1169142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 March 2020 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 March 2020 43 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 27 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 16 December 2017 On time Download