AL-FURQAN ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1169142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £7.96k £18.75k £34.39k £27.20k £18.19k
Total expenditure £8.75k £12.81k £16.22k £17.26k £5.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A