BRECKNOCK FEDERATION OF YFC

Charity number: 1169501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

41 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hugh Prothero Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Jamie Coles Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Rhianne Powell Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Lewis Davies Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Emyr Morgan Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Jones Bethan Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Carwyn Pugh Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record
Gareth Jones Trustee 24 September 2020
THE BUILTH MALE VOICE CHOIR (COR MEIBION LLANFAIR YM MUALLT) Received: On time
Emma Rees Trustee 26 September 2019
WALES FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS Received: On time
Emma Powell Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Leanne Davies Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Elin Havard Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Baden Davies Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Ryan Watkins Trustee 12 October 2017 None on record
Rhianwen Jones Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Eleanor Coles Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Robert Healey Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Ffion Hemmings Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Lewis Price Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
Cerith Davies Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Sonny Ryland Trustee 12 October 2017 None on record
REBECCA PROTHERO Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record
Elin Protheroe Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Sharon Healey Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
SHAN EVANS Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
JOHN PRICE Trustee 12 October 2017 None on record
Ieuan Parry Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
TOM PRITCHARD Trustee 12 October 2017 None on record
Roger Williams Trustee 26 September 2019
UNKNOWN DONOR'S CHARITY - CWRT-Y-FFAWYDDEN Received: On time
Daisy Hardwick Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record
Peter Hope Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Caitlin Harley Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Jayne Owen-Lowe Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
John Phillips Trustee 26 September 2019
SENNYBRIDGE YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB Received: On time
RAIFF DEVLIN Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Deryn Evans Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
SIAN HEALEY Trustee 12 October 2017
WALES FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS Received: On time
Rhian Jones Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Jonathan Davies Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Rhichard Davies Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Emma Jones Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record